Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3467524


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 Change - classification published on  01.01.2020 [2020/01]
05.12.2019 Change - classification published on  01.01.2020 [2020/01]
11.10.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
11.10.2019 Request for examination filed published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
11.10.2019 Change - designated states published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.10.2018 Change - representative