Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473955

EP3473955 - BUILT-IN DOMESTIC REFRIGERATOR WITH A DOOR POSITION DETECTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Flinner, Klaus
Bei den Flecken 60
89447 Zöschingen / DE
02 / Gutsche, Niklas
Otl-Aicher-Allee 4
89075 Ulm / DE
03 / Seelmeier, Michael
Im Gehren 31
73572 Heuchlingen / DE
 [2019/17]
Application number, filing date18199118.308.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171021869819.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017218698
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473955
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F25D23/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINBAUHAUSHALTSKÄLTEGERÄT MIT EINEM TÜRPOSITIONSERFASSUNGSSYSTEM[2019/17]
English:BUILT-IN DOMESTIC REFRIGERATOR WITH A DOOR POSITION DETECTING SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT MÉNAGER À ENCASTRER DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE LA POSITION DE PORTE[2019/17]
Examination procedure16.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2005279122  (COHEN MARC L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0053]; figures 1, 4, 7 * [Y] 6-8,10-12 [I] 4,5;
 [Y]JP2017181010  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 6-8,10-12 * paragraph [0129]; figures 1-45; claims 18, 19, 32, 33 *;
 [Y]EP3165856  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 6-8,10,12 * paragraphs [0251] - [0259]; figures 13, 14 *;
 [X]DE102006061083  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,10 * paragraphs [0040] - [0043]; figures 6, 7 *;
 [XYI]WO2006069882  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph letzt - page 5, paragraph letzt; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6-8,10-12 [I] 9