Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471168

EP3471168 - BATTERY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microvast Power Systems Co., Ltd.
No. 2198 Hongfeng Road
Huzhou, Zhejiang 313000 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Shaosong
No. 2198 Hongfeng Road
Huzhou, Zhejiang 313000 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date18199154.808.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateCN20171094605512.10.2017         Original published format: CN201710946055
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471168
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M2/30, H01R11/28
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BATTERIEMODUL[2019/16]
English:BATTERY MODULE[2019/16]
French:MODULE DE BATTERIE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2698847  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0052] - [0087]; figures 2-7 * [I] 10,13,14;
 [XI]US2017062780  (BAE SANGHOON [KR]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0034] - [0041] - [0 50] - [0088]; figures 1, 4, 6A, 6B, 6C, 6D, 7, 8, 9A, 9B, 11 * [I] 13,14;
 [XI]US2012231641  (SUGAI KATUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,11 * paragraphs [0040] - [0050]; figures 1-5 * [I] 10,13,14;
 [XI]JP2006338934  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,11,12 * paragraphs [0014] - [0029]; figures 2, 3, 6, 8 * [I] 10,13,14