Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473557

EP3473557 - PACKAGING FOR PACKING FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
17.05.2019Change - classificationpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
17.05.2019Change - classificationpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Groupe Guillin
Zone Industrielle
Ave. du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny
25290 Ornans / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / GUILLIN, François
Chemin des Vignes
25920 MOUTHIER HAUTE-PIERRE / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Littolff, Denis
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18199342.909.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateFR2017005979518.10.2017         Original published format: FR 1759795
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3473557
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3473557
Date:19.06.2019
Language:FR
[2019/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:B65D1/26, B65D43/02, B65D77/20
[2019/25]
Former International [2019/17]B65D1/26, B65D43/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNG FÜR LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTE[2019/17]
English:PACKAGING FOR PACKING FOOD PRODUCTS[2019/17]
French:EMBALLAGE DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES[2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2011082486  (AMHIL ENTPR, et al) [I] 1-3,18 * page 8, line 29 - page 12, line 18; figure 7; claim 17 *;
 [A]FR2946957  (GROUPE GUILLIN [FR]) [A] 1-3,18 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 19; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1892196  (FAMILJEN OLSSONS KOETT & CHARK [SE]) [A] 1-3,18 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] *;
 [A]EP0178730  (NOREN TONY) [A] 4-7 * page 6, line 10 - line 32; figure 5 *