Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471216

EP3471216 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
11.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
11.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
For all designated states
TE Connectivity Nederland B.V.
Rietveldenweg 32
5222 AR's-Hertogenbosch / NL
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Annis, Kyle Gary
5 Oakglade Drive
Hummelstown, PA 17036 / US
02 / Miller, Keith Edwin
195 Root Road
Manheim, PA 17545 / US
03 / Thackston, Kevin Michael
225 Hunters Creek Drive
York, PA 17406 / US
04 / Smink, Rutger Wilhelmus
2 Acacialaan
3930 Hamont-Achel / BE
05 / Tuin, Jacobus Nicolaas
80 Grasklokje
5684 HC Best / NL
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18199380.909.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171573098212.10.2017         Original published format: US201715730982
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471216
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/405, H01R13/518, H01R13/6587, H01R13/514
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER[2019/16]
English:ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR[2019/16]
French:CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/16]
Examination procedure08.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
08.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2014322985  (GULLA JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 1,2,9-15 * paragraphs [0098] - [0110]; figures 5a,5b * [Y] 3,6,7,16 [I] 8;
 [X]US2002098738  (ASTBURY ALLAN L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2,4,5 *;
 [X]US2005070160  (COHEN THOMAS S [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]US6471549  (LAPPOEHN JUERGEN [DE]) [Y] 3 * figure 14 * [A] 1,2;
 [YA]US2014273557  (CARTIER JR MARC B [US], et al) [Y] 16 * paragraph [0064] * [A] 1;
 [Y]US2008203547  (MINICH STEVEN E [US]) [Y] 6,7 * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US2007155241  (LAPPOHN JURGEN [DE]) [A] 1,8 * figure 5c *
by applicantUS7044794
 US7637767