Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470146

EP3470146 - DIRECT MECHANICALLY-OPERATED EXTRUSION PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
11.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
11.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Turla, Davide
Via Giulia Ravelli, 90
25069 Villa Carcina BS / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / TURLA, Davide
Via Giulia Ravelli, 90
25069 VILLA CARCINA BS / IT
02 / TOMELLERI, Raffaele
Via Orione, 6
37066 SOMMACAMPAGNA VR / IT
03 / ALBERTI, Angelo
Via Ruzzante, 6
32032 FELTRE BL / IT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Mittler, Andrea , et al
MITTLER & C. s.r.l.
Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18199519.210.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateIT2017011530012.10.2017         Original published format: IT201700115300
[2019/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470146
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:B21C23/21
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIREKT MECHANISCH-ANGETRIEBENE STRANGPRESSE[2019/16]
English:DIRECT MECHANICALLY-OPERATED EXTRUSION PRESS[2019/16]
French:PRESSE D'EXTRUSION DIRECTEMENT ET MÉCHANIQUEMENT ACTIONNÉE[2019/16]
Examination procedure09.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
09.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012244239  (YAMAMOTO TAKEHARU [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-5 *;
 [AD]WO2016056276  (UBE MACHINERY CORP LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-9 * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]JP2016163901  (UBE MACHINERY CORP LTD) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-13 *