Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473551

EP3473551 - SEAL SYSTEM FOR VARIABLE GEOMETRY GAPS IN AIRCRAFT SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / GEORGE, Nevin M.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)St Clair Jones, Gregory Arthur Langley , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18199556.410.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578853919.10.2017         Original published format: US201715788539
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473551
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B64D33/04, F02K1/80
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DICHTSYSTEM FÜR VARIABLE GEOMETRIEABSTÄNDE IN FLUGZEUGSYSTEMEN[2019/17]
English:SEAL SYSTEM FOR VARIABLE GEOMETRY GAPS IN AIRCRAFT SYSTEMS[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR DES ESPACES À GÉOMÉTRIE VARIABLE DANS DES SYSTÈMES D'AÉRONEF[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1873426  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,9,13,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1, 4 *;
 [X]DE69205901T  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,13,14 * paragraph [0002]; figures 3, 4 * * paragraph [0033] *;
 [X]US3121995  (PETER ALBANI) [X] 1-3,6-9,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6702300  (STEINETZ BRUCE M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,13,14 * figures 1,2,5,6 *;
 [X]US4290612  (STEVENS MARTIN L [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 13 - line 23; figure 8 *;
 [A]GB2265676  (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2587038  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4098076  (YOUNG JOHN H, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "DYNAMIC, HIGH-TEMPERATURE, FLEXIBLE SEAL", NTIS TECH NOTES, US DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, (19891001), ISSN 0889-8464, page 859, XP000074165 [X] 1,4,13,15 * the whole document *