Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470181

EP3470181 - ROBOT AND OPTICAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-8801 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Okamoto, Junichi
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi
Nagano, 392-8502 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18199583.810.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2017019822212.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017198222
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470181
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16, H04B10/07, H04B10/293, H01S3/10, H04B10/54, B25J19/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROBOTER UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTISCHEN ÜBERTRAGUNG[2019/16]
English:ROBOT AND OPTICAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE[2019/16]
French:ROBOT ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUE[2019/16]
Examination procedure06.08.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
06.08.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XDA]US2015295642  (NIKAIDO MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [XD] 1,9 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-8,10-14;
 [A]EP1629950  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0027]; figures 2A, 2B, 3 *
by applicantJP2015008380