Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470182

EP3470182 - ROBOT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
30.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
30.08.2019Change - designated statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-8801 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Harada, Tomoki
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi
Nagano, 392-8502 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18199584.610.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2017019729611.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017197296
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3470182
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3470182
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/40]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROBOTERSYSTEM[2019/16]
English:ROBOT SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE ROBOT[2019/16]
Examination procedure21.08.2019Examination requested  [2019/40]
21.08.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XDI]EP2993002  (CANON KK [JP]) [XD] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 9;
 [XI]US9193073  (HUANG CHUNG-HSIEN [TW], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 6, line 33 - column 8, line 20; figures 5, 6 * [I] 2,3,5-9;
 [A]JP2011133313  (CANON KK) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 10]; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - DI STEFANO ERIKA ET AL, "A multi-camera framework for visual servoing of a collaborative robot in industrial environments", 2017 22ND IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES AND FACTORY AUTOMATION (ETFA), IEEE, (20170912), doi:10.1109/ETFA.2017.8247645, pages 1 - 8, XP033292979 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ETFA.2017.8247645
by applicantJP2016052695