Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470364

EP3470364 - PROCESS FOR THE DISINFECTION OF COMPONENTS OF A FILLING MACHINE, AND FILLING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
25.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plasmatreat GmbH
Queller Str. 76-80
33803 Steinhagen / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BUSKE, Christian
Großdornberger Straße 111
33619 Bielefeld / DE
02 / SCHMITT-JOHN, Prof.-Dr. Thomas
Anne-Frank-Hof 3
33803 Steinhagen / DE
03 / HASSE, Daniel
Schlaunstraße 15
33104 Paderborn / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18199640.610.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateDE20171012350710.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017123507
DE20171012387113.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017123871
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470364
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B67C3/00, B67C7/00, A61L2/14, B65B55/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DESINFEKTION VON KOMPONENTEN EINER ABFÜLLANLAGE UND ABFÜLLANLAGE[2019/16]
English:PROCESS FOR THE DISINFECTION OF COMPONENTS OF A FILLING MACHINE, AND FILLING MACHINE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSINFECTION DE COMPOSANTS D'UNE INSTALLATION DE REMPLISSAGE ET INSTALLATION DE REMPLISSAGE[2019/16]
Examination procedure17.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
17.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2001054556  (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-15 * figures 1-4 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0032] *;
 [X]WO2017064741  (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0035] *;
 [I]EP3146983  (INP GREIFSWALD LEIBNIZ-INSTITUT FÜR PLASMAFORSCHUNG UND TECH E V [DE]) [I] 1-10 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0026] - [0044] - [0071] - [0089] *;
 [IA]WO2007071720  (PLASMATREAT GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 8 * figure 1 * * page 1, paragraph last * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph last * [A] 1,4,11,14;
 [A]WO2014161843  (PLASMATREAT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4,8,11,14 * figures 1-6 * * page 10, line 7 - page 14, line 32 *