Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471105

EP3471105 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANALYZING WORKFLOW ASSOCIATED WITH A PATHOLOGY LABORATORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dako Denmark A/S
Produktionsvej 42
2600 Glostrup / DK
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Juncker, Flemming
Albertslundvej 125 1. mf.
2625 Vallensbaek / SE
02 / Grahn, Mats
Trettiovägen 41-44
27193 Snarestad / SE
03 / Hasagic, Nihad
Fohlenweidstrasse 69
8615 Wermatswill / CH
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18199645.519.05.2009
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS2008007185221.05.2008         Original published format: US 71852
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471105
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G16H10/40
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE DES ARBEITSABLAUFS IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINEM PATHOLOGIELABOR[2019/16]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANALYZING WORKFLOW ASSOCIATED WITH A PATHOLOGY LABORATORY[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'ANALYSER UN FLUX DE TRAVAUX ASSOCIÉ À UN LABORATOIRE DE PATHOLOGIE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09749506.3  / EP2304628
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
10.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[I]US5366896  (MARGREY KEITH S [US] ET AL) [I] 1-18 * column 6, line 3 - column 32, line 14 *;
 [A]US2004230404  (MESSMER RICHARD PAUL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0103] *