Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470804

EP3470804 - INFRARED RADIATION SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
25 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BOUTAMI, Salim
25 rue Lavoisier
38100 GRENOBLE / FR
02 / GLIERE, Alain
62 rue Saint Laurent
38000 GRENOBLE / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18199664.610.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateFR2017005956512.10.2017         Original published format: FR 1759565
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470804
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/10, G01J3/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INFRAROTSTRAHLENQUELLE[2019/16]
English:INFRARED RADIATION SOURCE[2019/16]
French:SOURCE DE RAYONNEMENT INFRAROUGE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
05.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[IY]WO2017132429  (US GOV SEC NAVY [US]) [I] 1 * figures 7A-7B * [Y] 1-18;
 [Y]  - Anthony Lefebvre, "Simulation et conception de microsources infrarouges nanophotoniques pour la détection de gaz", Thesis, FR, (20151216), pages 1 - 121, URL: https://pastel.archives-ouvertes.fr/tel-01274342/document, (20180614), XP055484500 [Y] 1-18 * figures II-13, II-14, II-22, II-28, II-29, III-1, III-2 *
 [A]  - LEFEBVRE ANTHONY ET AL, "Influence of emissivity tailoring on radiative membranes thermal behavior for gas sensing applications", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, (20150219), vol. 213, doi:10.1016/J.SNB.2015.02.056, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 53 - 58, XP029124179 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2015.02.056