Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470407

EP3470407 - COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS MODULATORS OF TRPM8 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2020New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Firmenich Incorporated
250 Plainsboro Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
[2019/38]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Senomyx, Inc.
4767 Nexus Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Priest, Chad
2031 Bulrush Lane
Cardiff, California 92007 / US
02 / Noncovich, Alain
9675 Easter Way
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / Patron, Andrew
1701 Tara Way
San Marcos, California 92078 / US
04 / Ung, Jane
7379 Calle Cristobal 223
San Diego, California 92126 / US
 [2019/22]
Former [2019/16]01 / Priest, Chad
1819-A Crest Drive
Encinitas, California 92024 / US
02 / Noncovich, Alain
9675 Easter Way
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / Patron, Andrew
1701 Tara Way
San Marcos, California 92078 / US
04 / Ung, Jane
7379 Calle Cristobal 223
San Diego, California 92126 / US
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18199830.304.11.2011
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201041063410P05.11.2010         Original published format: US 41063410 P
US201161443490P16.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161443490 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470407
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07D333/20, C07D409/12, A61K31/381, A61K31/4155
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ALS MODULATOREN VON TRPM8 NÜTZLICHE VERBINDUNGEN[2019/16]
English:COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS MODULATORS OF TRPM8[2019/16]
French:COMPOSÉS UTILES COMME MODULATEURS DE TRPM8[2019/16]
Examination procedure14.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
14.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11838869.3  / EP2635572
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201909   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004113270  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 96, line 23 - line 24 *;
 [X]WO2007046075  (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * page 31, line 29 - line 30 *;
 [X]WO2004110983  (S A L V A T LAB SA [ES], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 84; compound 263 *;
 [A]WO2010026094  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 3,7-15 * claims 1, 4; table 2; compounds 4, 5 *
by applicantUS6468576
 US2007259354
    - HARRISON et al., Compendium of Synthetic Organic Methods, John Wiley and Sons, (19710000), vol. 1-8
    - Organic Reactions, John Wiley and Sons, (20060000), vol. 1-83
    - MARCH J.; SMITH M., Advanced Organic Chemistry, John Wiley and Sons