Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470685

EP3470685 - GAP CLOSING WEARLINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2020New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YIP, Justin
218 Marthas Way
Dover, NH New Hampshire 03820 / US
02 / FREEMAN, Thomas
3 Jessica Lane
Kennebunk, ME Maine 04043 / US
03 / AMADON, Colin G.
1 Portage Way
Kennebunk, ME Maine 04043 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date18200112.312.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171578505916.10.2017         Original published format: US201715785059
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470685
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/32, F01D5/30, F01D11/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPALTVERSCHLUSS-SCHLEISSRÜCKEN[2019/16]
English:GAP CLOSING WEARLINER[2019/16]
French:REVÊTEMENT D'USURE DE FERMETURE D'ESPACE[2019/16]
Examination procedure17.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
17.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
04.02.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
04.02.2020Request for further processing filed
04.02.2020Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.02.2020Decision despatched
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2010015660  (SNECMA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,13,15 * abstract * * figures 1,3,10 * * page 6, line 5 - line 11 * * page 8, lines 1-13 * [I] 4-12,14;
 [A]US2014241874  (RIOUX PHILIP ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0052] *;
 [A]WO2015023345  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP2511480  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP1561905  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *