blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3636735

EP3636735 - PROTEASE ENZYME VARIANTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.09.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.05.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.03.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.10.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.03.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AB Enzymes Oy
Tykkimäentie 15b
05200 Rajamäki / FI
[2020/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HELLMUTH, Hendrik
c/o AB Enzymes GmbH
Feldbergstrasse 78
64293 Darmstadt / DE
02 / JUNTUNEN, Kari
c/o Roal Oy
Tykkimäentie 15b
05200 Rajamäki / FI
03 / PALOHEIMO, Marja
c/o Roal Oy
Tykkimäentie 15b
05200 Rajamäki / FI
04 / VALTAKARI, Leena
c/o AB Enzymes Oy
Tykkimäentie 15b
05200 Rajamäki / FI
 [2020/16]
Representative(s)Boco IP Oy Ab
Kansakoulukatu 3
00100 Helsinki / FI
[2024/13]
Former [2020/16]Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date18200114.912.10.2018
[2020/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3636735
Date:15.04.2020
Language:EN
[2020/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3636735
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2018
ClassificationIPC:C11D3/386, C12N9/64
[2020/16]
CPC:
C12N9/6421 (EP); C11D3/38618 (US); C11D3/386 (EP);
C12N1/14 (US); C12N15/80 (US); C12N9/58 (US);
C12Y304/21 (US); C11D2111/12 (US); C12N2800/10 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/47]  
Former [2020/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VARIANTE EINER PROTEASE UND DIE VERWENDUNG DAVON[2020/16]
English:PROTEASE ENZYME VARIANTS AND USES THEREOF[2020/16]
French:VARIANT D'UNE PROTEASE ET SON L'UTILISATION[2022/49]
Former [2020/16]VARIANT D'UNE PROTÉASE ET SON UTILISATION
Examination procedure09.10.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2020Examination requested  [2020/47]
09.10.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.03.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2023Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2024Fee for grant paid
20.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009163400  (SIERKSTRA LAURENS NICOLAAS [NL], et al) [Y] 1-22* claims 100-104 *;
 [Y]WO2012131023  (AB ENZYMES OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-22 * sequence 18 *;
 [Y]DE102012209289  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-22 * sequence 1 *;
 [Y]EP2712915  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-22 * claims 1,5; sequence 3 *;
 [Y]WO2014138983  (UNIV CONCORDIA [CA]) [Y] 1-22 * sequences 372,378 *
by applicantWO9523221
 WO2011032988
 WO2011141358
 WO2012080201
 WO2012080202
 EP2691520
    - ANWAR, A; M SALEEMUDDIN, "Alkaline proteases: A review", Bioresource Technology, (19980000), vol. 64, pages 175 - 183
    - BAILEY M; NEVALAINEN H, "Induction, isolation and testing of stable Trichoderma reesei mutants with improved production of solubilizing cellulase", Enzyme Microb. Technol., (19810000), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0141-0229(81)90076-4, pages 153 - 157, XP023898144

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(81)90076-4
    - CHEN, Y-J; M INOUYE, "The intramolecular chaperone-mediated protein folding", Curr. Opin. Struct. Biol., (20080000), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.sbi.2008.10.005, pages 765 - 770, XP025761916

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sbi.2008.10.005
    - CHERRY, J. R.; FIDANTSEF, A. L., "Directed evolution of industrial enzymes: an update", Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (20030000), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/S0958-1669(03)00099-5, pages 438 - 443, XP002508541

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(03)00099-5
    - "Thermomycolin", GAUCHER G M; STEVENSON K J, Handbook of Proteolytic Enzymes, (20040000), pages 1834 - 1835
    - GUPTA, R; QK BEG; S KHAN; B CHAUHAN, "An overview on fermentation, downstream processing and properties of microbial alkaline protease", Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 60, pages 381 - 395
    - HAAKANA H; MIETTINEN-OINONEN A; JOUTSJOKI V; MANTYLA A; SUOMINEN P; VEHMAANPERA J, "Cloning of cellulase genes from Melanocarpus albomyces and their efficient expression in Trichoderma reesei", Enzyme Microb. Technol., (20040000), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enzmictec.2003.10.009, pages 159 - 167, XP008087716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2003.10.009
    - JOUTSJOKI, V. V.; T. K. TORKKELI; K. M. H. NEVALAINEN, "Transformation of Trichoderma reesei with the Hormoconis resinae glucoamylase P (gamP) gene: production of a heterologous glucoamylase by Trichoderma reesei", Curr. Genet., (19930000), vol. 24, pages 223 - 228
    - KARHUNEN, T.; A. MANTYLA; K. M. H. NEVALAINEN; P. L. SUOMINEN, "High frequency one-step gene replacement in Trichoderma reesei", I. Endoglucanase I overproduction. Mol. Gen. Genet., (19930000), vol. 241, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00279893, pages 515 - 522, XP001073778

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00279893
    - KALISZ, HM, "Microbial proteinases", Adv. Biochem. Eng. Biotechnol., (19880000), vol. 36, pages 1 - 65
    - MALARDIER L; MJ DABOUSSI; J JULIEN; F ROUSSEL; C SCAZZOCCHIO; Y BRYGOO, "Cloning of the nitrate reductase gene (niaD) of Aspergillus nidulans and its use for transformation of Fusarium oxysporum", Gene, (19890000), vol. 78, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(89)90322-3, pages 147 - 156, XP023543848

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(89)90322-3
    - MAURER, K-H., "Detergent proteases", Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (20040000), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/j.copbio.2004.06.005, pages 330 - 334, XP002355089

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2004.06.005
    - "Enzymes, Detergent", MAURER, K-H, Encyclopedia of Industrial Biotechnology: Bioprocess, Bioseparation, and Cell Technology, John Wiley & Sons, Inc, (20100000), pages 1 - 17
    - ONG PH; GAUCHER GM, "Production, purification and characterization of thermomycolase, the extracellular serine protease of the thermophilic fungus Malbranchea pulchella var. sulfurea", Can. J. Microbiol., (19750000), vol. 22, pages 165 - 175
    - PALOHEIMO, M.; A. MANTYLA; J. KALLIO; P. SUOMINEN, "High-yield production of a bacterial xylanase in the filamentous fungus Trichoderma reesei requires a carrier polypeptide with an intact domain structure", Appl. Env. Microbiol., (20030000), vol. 69, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.69.12.7073-7082.2003, pages 7073 - 7082, XP002363277

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.69.12.7073-7082.2003
    - PENTTILA M; H NEVALAINEN; M RATTO; E SALMINEN; J KNOWLES, "A versatile transformation system for the cellulolytic filamentous fungus Trichoderma reesei", Gene, (19870000), vol. 61, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(87)90110-7, pages 155 - 164, XP023545070

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(87)90110-7
    - RAO, MB; AM TANKSALE; MS GHATGE; VV DESHPANDE, "Molecular and biotechnological aspects of microbial proteases", Microbiol. Mol. Biol. Rev., (19980000), vol. 62, pages 597 - 635
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.