Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3473962 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3473962



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 72
12.10.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
12.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 8
12.10.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.10.2018 Description Search / examination 14
12.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
12.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
04.01.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.05.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
29.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
29.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
29.10.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
29.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1