Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3473962


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.11.2019 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
29.03.2019 Publication of search report published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
29.03.2019 Change - classification published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
29.03.2019 Change - classification published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
13.10.2018 Change - representative