blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3473962 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201811196115 EP18200259



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2019113283Global Dossier 18.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
JP2017201111 17.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20190043092Global Dossier 25.04.2019A
Priority number Date
JP2017201111 17.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2019074263Global Dossier 16.05.2019A
Priority number Date
JP2017201111 17.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN109668457Global Dossier 23.04.2019A
Priority number Date
JP2017201111 17.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3473962Global Dossier 01.05.2019A3
EP3473962 24.04.2019A2
Priority number Date
JP2017201111 17.10.2017