Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473962

EP3473962 - HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KOGA, Yoshihiro
c/o IBIDEN CO., LTD.
OGAKI-KITA PLANT
1-1, Kitagata
IBIGAWA-CHO, IBI-GUN, GIFU, 501-0695 / JP
02 / MURATA, Toshio
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18200259.212.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateJP2017020111117.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017201111
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3473962
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3473962
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F28F7/02, F28F21/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHER[2019/17]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER[2019/17]
French:ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2015115255  (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * [I] 9;
 [I]WO2013082066  (CORNING INC [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0036]; figures 7, 8 *
by applicantJP2015140972