Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473929

EP3473929 - METHOD FOR MINIMIZING NOX EMISSIONS DURING POX BASED SYNGAS PLANT STARTUP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ROESCH, Alexander
c/o AIR LIQUIDE GLOBAL E&C SOLUTIONS US Inc.
9811 Katy Freeway
Suite 100
HOUSTON, TX Texas 77024 / US
02 / KRIMLOWSKI, Paul Mandred
c/o L'AIR LIQUIDE, S. A.
75 Quai d' Orsay
75007 PARIS / FR
03 / LEHMANN, Maik
c/o AIR LIQUIDE S. A.
75 Quai d' Orsay
75007 PARIS / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Grout de Beaufort, François-Xavier
L'Air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Conan, Philippe Claude
L'Air Liquide SA
Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date18200325.115.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578735818.10.2017         Original published format: US201715787358
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473929
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F23L7/00, F23C9/08, F23D14/32
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMIERUNG VON NOX-EMISSIONEN WÄHREND DER INBETRIEBNAHME EINER POX-BASIERTEN SYNTHESEGASANLAGE[2019/17]
English:METHOD FOR MINIMIZING NOX EMISSIONS DURING POX BASED SYNGAS PLANT STARTUP[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE MINIMISER LES ÉMISSIONS DE NOX PENDANT LE DÉMARRAGE D'UNE USINE DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE À BASE DE POX[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.10.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/49]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6113874  (KOBAYASHI HISASHI [US]) [X] 1,7,9-11 * column 4, line 5 - line 39 * * column 7, line 20 - line 35 * * figure 4 * [I] 4-6,8,12,14;
 [X]US2016370005  (WU KUANG-TSAI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9,11,13 * page 2, paragraph 14 - page 3, paragraph 23 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2014007576  (ALEKSEEV ALEXANDER [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 59 - page 5, paragraph 71 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2009120338  (ADENDORFF MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 46 - page 3, paragraph 59 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0892214  (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 48 * * figure . *