Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473847

EP3473847 - WIND TURBINE GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2020New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
16-5, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MORISHITA, Kunihiro
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
16-5, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
02 / KATO, Motoki
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
16-5, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
03 / HASHIMOTO, Yukihiro
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
16-5, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
04 / KATSUURA, Hiroshi
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
16-5, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18200377.215.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateJP2017020065816.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017200658
JP2017020129517.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017201295
JP2017020941630.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017209416
JP2017020949830.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017209498
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473847
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F03D1/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WINDTURBINENGENERATOR[2019/17]
English:WIND TURBINE GENERATOR[2019/17]
French:GÉNÉRATEUR DE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
26.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
26.12.2019Request for further processing filed
26.12.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.01.2020Decision despatched
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2017144063  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [X] 1-25 * page 15, line 15 - line 23; figure 7 *;
 [X]DE3713024  (SCHNEIDER HERIBERT [DE]) [X] 1-25 * column 5, line 24 - line 27; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO2017108057  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [X] 1 * page 13, line 11 - page 16, line 27; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]GB2443886  (TODMAN MICHAEL TORR [GB]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE102012020052  (WERNER MOEBIUS ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 *