Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474349

EP3474349 - METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF AN ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.01.2020
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
25 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université de Nantes
1 quai de Tourville
44035 Nantes Cedex 1 / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3 Rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ZOLIN, Lorenzo
45 rue des Taillées
38400 SAINT MARTIN D'HERES / FR
02 / PORCHER, Willy
91 rue Abbé Grégoire
38000 GRENOBLE / FR
03 / SALOMON, Jérémie
335 impasse des Gauchets
38250 VILLARD DE LANS / FR
04 / GAUBICHER, Joel
56 rue du Maine
44000 NANTES / FR
05 / JIMENEZ, Pablo
10 rue Beauregard
44000 NANTES / FR
06 / LESTRIEZ, Bernard
22 avenue de l'Epéronnière
44000 NANTES / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18200389.715.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateFR2017005975217.10.2017         Original published format: FR 1759752
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474349
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/04, H01M4/1391, H01M4/1393, H01M4/74
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONTINUIERLICHES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER ELEKTRODE[2019/17]
English:METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF AN ELECTRODE[2019/17]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION EN CONTINU D'UNE ELECTRODE[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
23.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2016104679  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * figure 8a *;
 EP3240095  [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0099] - [0102] - [0113] , [ 118]; figure 8a *;
 [A]JPH10144310  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2017061714  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-17 * figure 4 *;
 EP3312910  [ ] (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [ ] * paragraphs [0016] , [0 33] - [0037] - [0 45] *;
 [A]JPS58223261  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [A]US2010075224  (NAOI KATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0027]; figures 1,2 *