Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474068

EP3474068 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY PANEL AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
12.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
12.04.2019Change - designated statespublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Haeil
Hyundai Emcotown Central Park Apt.
Sangdo 1-dong, Dongjakgu
112-902 Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Yongseok
Tongil-ro, Seodaemun-gu
105-1402, 348 Seoul / KR
03 / Park, Jinho
Byoksan Hansung Apt., Gwonseon-dong, Gwonseon-gu
Suwon-si
809-801 Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Han, Gabsoo
Ichon-ro 88-gil, Yongsan-gu
102-601, 30 Seoul / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18200398.815.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateKR2017013636820.10.2017         Original published format: KR 20170136368
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474068
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/13357, G02F1/1335
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGETAFEL UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2019/17]
English:LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY PANEL AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME[2019/17]
French:PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES LE COMPRENANT[2019/17]
Examination procedure05.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
05.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO2014061510  (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 1-7,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 8-12;
 [YA]WO2014123836  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-7,13-15 * page 3, line 17 - page 9, line 25; figures 1-5 * [A] 8-12;
 [A]WO2008152436  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 16 - page 12, line 20; figure 2 *;
 [Y]CN105954932  (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 3 * figures 3,4 *;
 [Y]EP2679645  (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0248] *