Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473111

EP3473111 - CRIMPING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
16.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - designated statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D S.p.A.
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna / IT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BALDANZA, Nicola
Via Gesso 20/2
40069 Zola Predosa Bologna / IT
02 / SARTONI, Massimo
Via Leandro Alberti 79
40139 Bologna / IT
03 / FEDERICI, Luca
Via Lippo di Dalmasio 13
40135 Bologna / IT
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Bianciardi, Ezio
Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18200609.816.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateIT2017011780418.10.2017         Original published format: IT201700117804
[2019/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473111
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A24B3/14, A24D3/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/38]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CRIMPEINHEIT[2019/17]
English:CRIMPING UNIT[2019/17]
French:UNITÉ DE SERTISSAGE[2019/17]
Examination procedure08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2019Examination requested  [2019/38]
08.08.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[YA]US3383449  (ADOLF MULLER PAUL) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 60; figures 1,2,9 * [A] 3-13;
 [YA]GB1314511  (MOLINS MACHINE CO LTD) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 37 - line 47 * * page 2, line 39 - line 112; figure - * [A] 3-13;
 [YA]WO2016097100  (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 15; figure - * [A] 3-13;
 [A]EP0088178  (CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2016071267