Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466569

EP3466569 - DEVICE FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CL Schutzrechtsverwaltungs GmbH
An der Zeil 2
96215 Lichtenfels / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Hetzel, Ralf
Bahnhofstraße 1
96231 Bad Staffelstein / DE
02 / Stammberger, Jens
Gnaileser Straße 55
96472 Rödental / DE
03 / Zeulner, Fabian
Traufelder 10
96215 Lichtenfels / DE
04 / Dr. Bechmann, Florian
Sudetenstraße 15
96215 Lichtenfels / DE
05 / Hofmann, Alexander
Geutenreuth 42
96260 Weismain / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hafner & Kohl
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schleiermacherstraße 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18200654.408.06.2017
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateDE20161012176914.11.2016         Original published format: DE102016121769
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466569
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B22F3/105, B28B1/00, B29C64/153, B29C64/35, B29C64/20, B29C64/259, B33Y30/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANLAGE ZUR ADDITIVEN HERSTELLUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER OBJEKTE[2019/15]
English:DEVICE FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS[2019/15]
French:INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS PAR LA MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE[2019/15]
Examination procedure17.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
29.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP17175024.3  / EP3321006
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102014016718  (CL SCHUTZRECHTSVERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0018] , [0025] , [0028] - [0029] - [0032]; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]DE102012002955  (CL SCHUTZRECHTSVERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0019] , [0020] , [0027]; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]EP1961514  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 25] - [0026] - [0 28] - [0029]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1704989  (3D SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 11,3, 10-12 *