Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474310

EP3474310 - INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE FOR MASS SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shimadzu Corporation
1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho
Nakagyo-ku
Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 604-8511 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / IWAMOTO, Shinichi
c/o Shimadzu Corporation
1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho
Nakagyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP
02 / HIOKI, Yusaku
c/o Shimadzu Corporation
1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho
Nakagyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18200707.016.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateJP2017020152018.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017201520
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474310
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01J49/00, // H01J49/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MASSENSPEKTROMETER[2019/17]
English:INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE FOR MASS SPECTROMETER[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS POUR SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
22.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2017085876  (KRATOS ANALYTICAL LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 US2019006162  [ ] (MATSUSHITA TOMOYOSHI [GB]) [ ] * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 1,2,6,7,8 *;
 [Y]US2007051899  (TRUCHE JEAN-LUC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056] *
by applicantWO2008136058