Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469889

EP3469889 - PLANT CULTIVATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.12.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eurochampignon bvba
Oostrozebekestraat 215
8770 Ingelmunster / BE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Lapierre, Stefaan
Oostrozebekestraat 215
8770 Ingelmunster / BE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)BiiP cvba
Lambroekstraat 5A
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]BiiP cvba
Culliganlaan 1B
1831 Diegem (Bruxelles) / BE
Application number, filing date18200784.916.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateEP2018016030606.03.2018         Original published format: EP 18160306
EP2018018554625.07.2018         Original published format: EP 18185546
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469889
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A01G18/62, A01G18/70
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PFLANZENZUCHTVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:PLANT CULTIVATION APPARATUS[2019/16]
French:APPAREIL DE CULTURE DE PLANTES[2019/16]
Examination procedure05.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
05.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2019Observations by third parties
06.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XI]CN207040403U  (TIANJIN YOUMAO EDIBLE FUNGUS DEV CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] * * figure - * [I] 2-15;
 [XI]CN207040404U  (TIANJIN YOUMAO EDIBLE FUNGUS DEV CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - * [I] 2-15;
 [XI]JP2012110285  (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - * [I] 10;
 [XI]CN103238477  (SUZHOU LVDIAN HORTICULTURAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - * [I] 2-15;
 [XD]NL1027511C  (HAVATEC B V [NL]) [XD] 1 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [XDI]JP2012055234  (JAPAN CARLIT CO LTD) [XD] 1 * figure - * [I] 10
by applicantCN203985152U
 NL1027511C
 JP2012055234
 CN206525189U
otherEP3578037
    - Gerben Straatsma; Van Tuijl Bart A J, "Nieuwe methoden voor de handmatige oogst van champignons", (2007), page 20, URL: https://www.wur.nl/nl/Publicatie-details.htm?publicationId=publication-way-333630383532, XP055648091