Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474203

EP3474203 - PRODUCT BENCHMARKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2020New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dassault Systemes Americas Corp.
175 Wyman Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PRASAD, Ajay
900 North Squirrel Road, Suite 100
Auburn Hills, MI Michigan 48309 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18200838.316.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578591117.10.2017         Original published format: US201715785911
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474203
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PRODUKT-BENCHMARKING[2019/17]
English:PRODUCT BENCHMARKING[2019/17]
French:ÉVALUATION COMPARATIVE DE PRODUIT[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
13.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
13.01.2020Request for further processing filed
13.01.2020Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.01.2020Decision despatched
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010191579  (SUDARSHAN D R [IN], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0036] *;
 [I]US2009037869  (HAMILTON DARIN EDWARD [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0034] *;
 [I]JP2003157345  (ITID CONSULTING KK) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0006] - [0032] *