Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473293

EP3473293 - REDUCED PRESSURE DELIVERY SYSTEM HAVING A MANUALLY-ACTIVATED PUMP FOR PROVIDING TREATMENT TO LOW-SEVERITY WOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HEATON, Keith Patrick
3 Clifton Road
Penn Hill
Poole, Dorset BH14 1TY / GB
02 / HARDMAN, Ian James
74 Victoria Avenue
Bournemouth, Dorset BH9 2RP / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
Application number, filing date18200924.115.10.2007
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20060851494P13.10.2006         Original published format: US 851494 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473293
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61M27/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:UNTERDRUCKABGABESYSTEM MIT MANUELL BETÄTIGTER PUMPE ZUR BEHANDLUNG LEICHTER WUNDEN[2019/17]
English:REDUCED PRESSURE DELIVERY SYSTEM HAVING A MANUALLY-ACTIVATED PUMP FOR PROVIDING TREATMENT TO LOW-SEVERITY WOUNDS[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME D'APPLICATION DE PRESSION RÉDUITE COMPORTANT UNE POMPE À COMMANDE MANUELLE POUR TRAITER DES BLESSURES PEU SÉVÈRES[2019/17]
Examination procedure15.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07839541.5  / EP2079507
EP16187917.6  / EP3120893
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[I]WO9200111  (REGENT LTD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * page 6, lines 2-27; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2003040687  (BOYNTON THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0034]; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - Fleck, "palliative dilemmas : wound odeur", J. Wound Care CA, (20060101), URL: http://www.woundcarecanada.ca/, (20160808), XP055293968 [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 7 *