Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473565

EP3473565 - VACUUM SUCTION CUP WITH ACTIVELY VARIABLE LENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
30.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
30.08.2019Change - designated statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMC Deutschland GmbH
Boschring 13-15
63329 Egelsbach / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Kallis, Jürgen
Hindenburgstraße 49/1
75417 Mühlacker / DE
02 / Tewes, Steffen
Hengstetterstraße 28
75395 Ostelsheim / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Friedrichstraße 2-6
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18200944.917.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171012447219.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017124472
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473565
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B65G47/91, B25J15/06, B25J9/14
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/40]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VAKUUMSAUGNAPF MIT AKTIV VARIIERBARER LÄNGE[2019/17]
English:VACUUM SUCTION CUP WITH ACTIVELY VARIABLE LENGTH[2019/17]
French:VENTOUSE SOUS VIDE À LONGUEUR ACTIVEMENT VARIABLE[2019/17]
Examination procedure21.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2019Examination requested  [2019/40]
21.08.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO8803462  (KARLSSON ULF [SE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10-12,15 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3; figures 1-2 * [Y] 9-11,13,14 [I] 3-5;
 [XYI]US2017073174  (TANAKA JUNYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0088]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 7-11,13,14 [I] 3-5;
 [XYI]JPH08264995  (TOSHIBA F A SYSTEM ENG, et al) [X] 1,2,6,15 * abstract * [Y] 7-11 [I] 4,5;
 [XYI]DE1431877  (BING & GRONDAHLS PORCELLAENSFA) [X] 1,2,6,12,15 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 2; figure 2 * [Y] 7-11 [I] 4,5;
 [Y]DE202007002876U  (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [Y] 7-9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]EP2335884  (FESTO AG & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]WO8603816  (SPINE ROBOTICS AB [SE]) [A] 10,11 * page 5, paragraph 3; figure 7 *