Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473823

EP3473823 - SILENCER WITH SOUND INSULATION INSERT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SILENCER WITH SOUND INSULATION INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/17]SOUND INSULATION INSERT, SILENCER WITH SAME AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SOUND INSULATION INSERT
[2019/36]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - German titlepublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - English titlepublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - French titlepublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eberspächer Exhaust Technology GmbH & Co. KG
Homburger Strasse 95
66539 Neunkirchen / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Zdravkov, Hristo
Yitzhak-Rabin-Straße 13
70376 Stuttgart / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Diehl & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Strasse 9
80636 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201009.017.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171012475023.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017124750
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473823
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F01N1/08, F01N13/18
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/27]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALLDÄMPFER MIT SCHALLDÄMPFEREINSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHALLDÄMPFER MIT SCHALLDÄMPFEREINSATZ[2019/36]
English:SILENCER WITH SOUND INSULATION INSERT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SILENCER WITH SOUND INSULATION INSERT[2019/36]
French:SILENCIEUX AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE SILENCIEUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SILENCIEUX AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE SILENCIEUX[2019/36]
Former [2019/17]SCHALLDÄMPFEREINSATZ, SCHALLDÄMPFER MIT DIESEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHALLDÄMPFEREINSATZES
Former [2019/17]SOUND INSULATION INSERT, SILENCER WITH SAME AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SOUND INSULATION INSERT
Former [2019/17]ÉLÉMENT DE SILENCIEUX, SILENCIEUX DOTÉ DUDIT ÉLÉMENT DE SILENCIEUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE SILENCIEUX
Examination procedure23.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/27]
23.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE102009053429  (GILLET HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [0035] - [0037]; figures 2a,2b * [Y] 4,5,8,11 [I] 10,12-14;
 [XAI]DE10060522  (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraphs [0044] - [0049]; figure 1 * [A] 4,9 [I] 10,12,13;
 [YA]DE112014003814T  (TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE OPERATING CO INC [US]) [Y] 5,11 * paragraph [0061]; figures 3,4,6 * * paragraphs [0068] , [0074] , [0075]; figures 11,12 * [A] 1-4,6-10,12-14;
 [Y]US4111278  (BERGMAN ERNEST R) [Y] 4,8 * column 2, line 36 - line 47; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP2375017  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * paragraph [0020]; figures 2,6,11 *