Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473078

EP3473078 - HAYMAKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLAAS Saulgau GmbH
Zeppelinstrasse 2
88348 Bad Saulgau / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Boll, Ulrich
Silcher Str. 3
88348 Bad Saulgau / DE
 [2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201018.117.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171012423918.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017124239
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473078
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A01D78/10, A01D78/12
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEUWERBUNGSMASCHINE[2019/17]
English:HAYMAKING MACHINE[2019/17]
French:MACHINE DE FENAISON[2019/17]
Examination procedure25.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2250874  (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]CH479997  (BUCHER GUYER AG MASCH [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,7 *;
 [AD]EP2194770  (LELY PATENT NV [NL]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0979600  (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,3 *