Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473366

EP3473366 - METHOD FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL MACHINING OF COMPLEX INTERNAL ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURED SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LYNCH, Matthew E.
9 Village Square
Canton, CT Connecticut 06019 / US
02 / TWELVES, Wendell V.
218 Conestoga Way
Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date18201046.217.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578589217.10.2017         Original published format: US201715785892
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473366
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B23H3/04, B23H9/14, B22F3/105, C25F3/16
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN BEARBEITUNG KOMPLEXER, INNERER, GENERATIV GEFERTIGTER OBERFLÄCHEN[2019/17]
English:METHOD FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL MACHINING OF COMPLEX INTERNAL ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURED SURFACES[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'USINAGE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE DE SURFACES INTERNES COMPLEXES FABRIQUÉES DE FAÇON ADDITIVE[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XPA]WO2017220633  (EXTRUDE HONE GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-5,8-11,13-15 * abstract * * page 6, lines 6-8 * * page 6, lines 9-13 * * page 9, lines 7-11 * * page 9, lines 13-15 * [A] 6,7,12;
 [XYI]US5059289  (GASKELL DAVID J [GB]) [X] 1,8,9 * figures 3,4 * * column 3, lines 44-55 * [Y] 2 [I] 10,11,13,15;
 [Y]DE102011100174  (KENNAMETAL EXTRUDE HONE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2 * figure 5 *;
 [XP]WO2017218101  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [XP] 1,10 * figures 6-8 *;
 [XP]CN108637412  (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS & ASTRONAUTICS) [XP] 1,10 * abstract *