Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467232

EP3467232 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO HAND RAILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pipex Limited
Pipex House
Devon Enterprise Facility
1 Belliver Way
Roborough, Plymouth
PL6 7BP / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / EVES, Simon
71 Woodside Drive
Waterfoot
Glasgow, G76 0HD / GB
02 / HEWSTONE, Matthew
5 Lease Cottages
Hele
Exeter, EX5 4PZ / GB
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Bryers LLP
7 Gay Street
Bath, Bath and North East Somerset BA1 2PH / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18201071.002.02.2011
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateGB2010000200408.02.2010         Original published format: GB 201002004
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3467232
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
ClassificationInternational:E04F11/18
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT HANDSCHIENEN[2019/15]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO HAND RAILS[2019/15]
French:PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTÉS À DES GARDE-CORPS OU S'Y RAPPORTANT[2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11705223.3  / EP2534319
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
06.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201909   M06   Not yet paid