blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3473541


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
11.10.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
11.10.2019 Request for examination filed published on  13.11.2019 [2019/46]
11.10.2019 Change - designated states published on  13.11.2019 [2019/46]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
17.10.2018 Change - representative