Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473177

EP3473177 - BASELINE IMPEDANCE MAPS FOR TISSUE PROXIMITY INDICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd.
4 Hatnufa Street
Yokneam 2066717 / IL
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / OSADCHY, Daniel
c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd.
P.O. Box 275
4 Hatnufa Street
2066717 Yokneam / IL
02 / BAR-TAL, Meir
c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd.
P.O. Box 275
4 Hatnufa Street
2066717 Yokneam / IL
03 / MIZRAHI, Liron Shmuel
c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd.
P.O. Box 275
4 Hatnufa Street
2066717 Yokneam / IL
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Small, Gary James
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201142.918.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578828619.10.2017         Original published format: US201715788286
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473177
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/06, A61B5/00, // A61B5/042
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REFERENZIMPEDANZKARTEN FÜR GEWEBENÄHERUNGSINDIKATIONEN[2020/02]
English:BASELINE IMPEDANCE MAPS FOR TISSUE PROXIMITY INDICATIONS[2019/17]
French:CARTES D'IMPÉDANCE DE RÉFÉRENCE POUR DES INDICATIONS DE PROXIMITÉ DE TISSU[2019/17]
Former [2019/17]BASISLINIENIMPEDANZKARTEN FÜR GEWEBENÄHERUNGSINDIKATIONEN
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2016181316  (NAVIX INT LTD, et al) [I] 1-18 * page 48, line 24 - page 49, line 26 * * page 5, lines 25-27, page 31, line 28 - page 32, line 14 * * the whole document *;
 [I]US2016143686  (TUNAY ILKER [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0053] - [0057] - [0 64] - [0065] - [0 86] - [0087] - [ 108] * * the whole document *;
 [A]US2016242667  (FAY LEON [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0092] - [0094] - [ 108] - [0112] *
by applicantUS2010286550
 US8456182