Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473226

EP3473226 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ABSORBENT CORES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fameccanica.Data S.p.A.
Via Alessandro Volta 10
65129 Pescara / IT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SABLONE, Gabriele
Strada Vicinale Colle Cervone del Palazzo, 18/A
I-65125 Pescara / IT
02 / CAPPUCCI, Antonio
Contr. Fratte, 2
I-65010 Carpineto della Nora (Pescara) / IT
03 / GIANSANTE, Antonio
Via Monte Miletto, 1/a
I-65010 Spoltore (Pescara) / IT
04 / CIPRIANI, Alessandro
Frazione Collecaruno, 6
I-64100 Teramo / IT
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Marchitelli, Mauro
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx
Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6
10123 Torino / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201144.518.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateIT2017011909520.10.2017         Original published format: IT201700119095
[2019/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473226
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/532, A61F13/15, B29C65/08, B29C65/78
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/44]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SAUGFÄHIGEN KERNEN[2019/17]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ABSORBENT CORES[2019/17]
French:APPAREIL ET METOD POUR LA PRODUCTION DE NOYAUX ABSORBANTS[2019/17]
Examination procedure23.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/44]
23.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2873397  (ZUIKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0060] - [0118]; figure - *;
 [I]US2013284361  (TSUJIMOTO YOSHIO [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0059] - [0089]; figure - *;
 [A]WO2017171777  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 16, line 14 - page 19, line 12; figure 3 *