Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3473880 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3473880



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 127
03.12.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.12.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.11.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
24.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
24.10.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
24.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
24.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 5
22.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
22.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
18.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
18.10.2018 Description Search / examination 21
18.10.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 6
18.10.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5