blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3473880
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10309468Global Dossier 04.06.2019B2
US2019120302 25.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715789223 20.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3473880Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715789223 20.10.2017