Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473880

EP3473880 - TORQUE PLATE BARREL HAVING BLENDED BARREL SUPPORT PEDESTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
4 Coliseum Centre
2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / COOLEY, Phillip E.
135 Canterbury Drive
Kettering, OH 45429 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date18201268.218.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578922320.10.2017         Original published format: US201715789223
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473880
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F16D55/36, F16D65/18
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DREHMOMENTPLATTENZYLINDER MIT GEMISCHTEM ZYLINDERSTÜTZSOCKEL[2019/17]
English:TORQUE PLATE BARREL HAVING BLENDED BARREL SUPPORT PEDESTAL[2019/17]
French:CYLINDRE DE PLAQUE DE COUPLE COMPORTANT UN SOCLE DE SUPPORT DE CYLINDRE FUSIONNÉ[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5926932  (NIESPODZIANY DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-10,14,15 * column 2, line 41 - column 6, line 15; figure - * [I] 11-13;
 [XAI]US6003641  (BOEHRINGER WILFRED E [US], et al) [X] 9 * column 2, line 63 - column 6, line 7; figure - * [A] 1-8,11-15 [I] 10;
 [XAI]FR1354811  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER) [X] 9 * page 1, column 2, line 23 - page 2, column 2, line 39; figure - * [A] 1-8,11-15 [I] 10;
 [XA]EP1510719  (MESSIER BUGATTI [FR]) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0036]; figure - * [A] 1-8,11-15;
 [XAI]US5321876  (MASSING LYLE E [US], et al) [X] 9 * column 2, line 29 - column 5, line 25; figure - * [A] 1-8,11-15 [I] 10