Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474328

EP3474328 - COMBINATION SENSORS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LEEM, Dong-Seok
121-802, Dongtanbanseok-ro 277, Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / LEE, Gae Hwang
114-1103, 74, Sunae-ro, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / JIN, Yong Wan
101-206, 242-12, Haedeung-ro, Dobong-gu
01387 Seoul / KR
04 / LEE, Tae Yon
103-302, 30, Hakdong-ro 68-gil, Gangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date18201308.618.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateKR2017013625520.10.2017         Original published format: KR 20170136255
KR2018012263815.10.2018         Original published format: KR 20180122638
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3474328
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3474328
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/146
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONSSENSOREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN[2019/17]
English:COMBINATION SENSORS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES[2019/17]
French:CAPTEURS COMBINÉS ET DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES[2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[X]US5373182  (NORTON PAUL R [US]) [X] 1,10-12,15,16 * figures 3,4 *;
 [XI]US2016087001  (TENNANT WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0 16] - [0030]; figures 1-2 * [I] 16;
 [A]US2015287766  (KIM TAE-CHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-24 *;
 [X]US2014098192  (PARK YONG-HWA [KR], et al) [X] 17,18 * paragraphs [0056] , [0 64] , [0065] , [0 74] - [0080]; figures 1,6,10, 14 *;
 [A]US2002030755  (UCHINO FUMIKO [JP]) [A] 17,18 * figures 1-3 *