blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3480055

EP3480055 - VEHICLE SEAT WITH MOVABLE TOP PART OF BACK-REST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GRAMMER AG
Grammer-Allee 2
92289 Ursensollen / DE
[2020/42]
Former [2019/19]For all designated states
Grammer AG
Georg-Grammer-Straße 2
92224 Amberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haller, Thomas
Heideweg 10a
92289 Ursensollen / DE
 [2019/19]
Representative(s)Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Prüfeninger Straße 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
[2019/19]
Application number, filing date18201422.519.10.2018
[2019/19]
Priority number, dateDE20171012533827.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017125338
[2019/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3480055
Date:08.05.2019
Language:DE
[2019/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3480055
Date:27.05.2020
Language:DE
[2020/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2019
ClassificationIPC:B60N2/02, B60N2/14, B60N2/22, B60N2/90
[2019/19]
CPC:
B60N2/2222 (EP,US); B60N2/0252 (EP,US); B60N2/0272 (EP,US);
B60N2/146 (EP,US); B60N2/2851 (US); B60N2/38 (US);
B60N2/64 (US); B60N2/868 (US); B60N2002/022 (US);
B60N2002/948 (EP,US); B60N2205/35 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Former [2019/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGSITZ MIT VERLAGERBAREM RUECKENLEHNENOBERTEIL[2019/19]
English:VEHICLE SEAT WITH MOVABLE TOP PART OF BACK-REST[2019/19]
French:SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE AVEC PARTIE SUPERIEURE DE DOSSIER DEPLACABLE[2019/19]
Examination procedure29.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
04.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.03.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2020Fee for grant paid
15.04.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.03.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.10.2018
AL27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
MK27.05.2020
MT27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
IE19.10.2020
LU19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/28]HU19.10.2018
AL27.05.2020
CY27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
MT27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
IE19.10.2020
LU19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
Former [2021/46]AL27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
IE19.10.2020
LU19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
Former [2021/36]AL27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
LU19.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
Former [2021/31]AL27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
MC27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
LU19.10.2020
Former [2021/24]AL27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SI27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
PL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SK27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL27.05.2020
CZ27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
EE27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL27.05.2020
DK27.05.2020
ES27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RO27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
SM27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL27.05.2020
FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
NL27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
BG27.08.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
RS27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI27.05.2020
HR27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
LV27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
GR28.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI27.05.2020
LT27.05.2020
SE27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
PT28.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT27.05.2020
NO27.08.2020
IS27.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS27.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102011055895  (GRAMMER AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102014117101  (GRAMMER AG [DE]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.