Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474239

EP3474239 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ACTIVATION OF A SAFETY FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUF Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG
Steeger Str. 17
42551 Velbert / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHINDLER, Mirko
Am Diek 13
42549 Velbert / DE
02 / NEUHOFF, Stefan
Honnschaftenstraße 23
45329 Essen / DE
03 / STEEGMANN, Dennis
Auf der Egge 19
42555 Velbert / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Bals, Rüdiger , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201424.119.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171012438019.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017124380
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474239
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G07C9/00, // B60R25/24
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AKTIVIERUNG EINER SICHERHEITSFUNKTION[2019/17]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ACTIVATION OF A SAFETY FUNCTION[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ACTIVATION D'UNE FONCTION DE SÉCURITÉ[2019/17]
Examination procedure26.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2015348341  (BAXLEY ROBERT JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,12-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0106] * [I] 2-5,9-11;
 [X]DE102012024872  (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,8,11-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] *;
 [A]US2015180834  (SOBEL WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 5,10,11,14 * paragraph [0002] *;
 [A]WO2012069544  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 5,10,11,14 * abstract *;
 [A]  - KAI SAN CHOI ET AL, "Automatic source camera identification using the intrinsic lens radial distortion", OPTICS EXPRESS, US, (20060101), vol. 14, no. 24, doi:10.1364/OE.14.011551, ISSN 2161-2072, page 11551, XP055566375 [A] 5,10,11,14 * Titel *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.14.011551