Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473622

EP3473622 - COMPOUND AND ORGANIC PHOTOELECTRIC DEVICE, IMAGE SENSOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019 [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019 [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIN, Ji Soo
103-2002, 195, Mapo-daero, Mapo-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / CHOI, Yeong Suk
110-806, 32, Taejang-ro 82beon-gil, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / SHIBATA, Katsunori
812, 47-11, Metapolis-ro, Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / CHOI, Taejin
519, 111, Central town-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / YUN, Sung Young
706-602, Gwonjung-ro 82, Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
06 / KWON, Ohkyu
246-803, 135, Olympic-ro, Songpa-gu
Seoul / KR
07 / KIM, Sang Mo
909-2301, Dongtan Prun Maeul Posco The sharp
1134, Neung-dong, Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
08 / SHIBUYA, Hiromasa
1008-1301, 45, Gwanggyohosugongwon-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
09 / LEE, Gae Hwang
114-1103, 74, Sunae-ro, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
10 / JIN, Yong Wan
101-206, 242-12, Haedeung-ro, Dobong-gu
Seoul / KR
11 / CHOI, Hyesung
508-1604, Dobong-ro 136-gil 28, Dobong-gu
Seoul / KR
12 / BAIK, Chul
824-705, 232, Yeongtong-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
13 / HONG, Hye Rim
A-523, 10, Docheong-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date18201486.019.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateKR2017013688220.10.2017         Original published format: KR 20170136882
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473622
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07D421/04, C07F7/10, C07F7/30, C07D471/04, C07D471/14, C09K11/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNG UND ORGANISCHE PHOTOELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG, BILDSENSOR UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2019/17]
English:COMPOUND AND ORGANIC PHOTOELECTRIC DEVICE, IMAGE SENSOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME[2019/17]
French:COMPOSÉ ET DISPOSITIF PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE ORGANIQUE, CAPTEUR D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT[2019/17]
Examination procedure20.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[AP]EP3252051  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-15 * example - *;
 [AP]EP3243822  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-15 * example - *;
 [A]EP3026722  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * example - *;
 [A]EP3173410  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * example - *;
 [A]  - HAMADA ET AL, "Dye-sensitized photoelectric converter, photoelectrochemical cell, and dye solution for photoelectric converter", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACT, (20120223), Database accession no. 2012:265934, URL: CAPLUS; STN, XP002771880 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicant   - TAKAHASHI, K.; TARUTANI, S., "Efficient Synthesis of 2-lodo and 2-Dicyanomethyl Derivatives of Thiophene, Selenophene, Tellurophene and Thieno[3,2-b]thiophene", Heterocycles, (19960000), vol. 43, pages 1927 - 1935
    - J. Pharmacol., (19440000), vol. 82, no. 292, page 4417
    - Dalton Transactions, (20150000), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 1473 - 1482