Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3473622 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201811227739 EP18201486



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019123285Global Dossier 25.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
KR20180125469 19.10.2018
KR20170136882 20.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20190044555Global Dossier 30.04.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20170136882 20.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN109694374Global Dossier 30.04.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20170136882 20.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3473622Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
KR20170136882 20.10.2017