Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473566

EP3473566 - CONVEYOR SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORTING OBJECTS IN A DIP COATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Interruptionpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eisenmann SE
Tübinger Strasse 81
71032 Böblingen / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Riegraf, Martin
Otto-Fischer-Weg 21
72766 Reutlingen / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestraße 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date18201549.519.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171012460920.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017124609
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473566
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B65G49/04, B05B13/04, B62D65/18
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FÖRDERSYSTEM ZUM TRANSPORT VON GEGENSTÄNDEN IN EINER TAUCHBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE[2019/17]
English:CONVEYOR SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORTING OBJECTS IN A DIP COATING SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT DESTINÉ AU TRANSPORT DES OBJETS DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT PAR IMMERSION[2019/17]
Examination procedure15.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
15.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Stay/Interruption31.07.2019Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2019/40]
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011176894  (GUERRA GIANCARLO [IT], et al) [A] 1-8 * pages 1-3; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2013026006  (SCHURBA ALEXANDER [DE]) [A] 1-8 * pages 1-3; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE102006026089  (EISENMANN ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-8 * pages 1-8; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE1257674  (ALMCO SUPERSHEEN DIVISION OF G) [A] 1-8 * columns 1-10; figures 1-6 *