Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473176

EP3473176 - ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE FOR NERVE MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMEPA-INDUSTRIES
88 avenue du Général de Gaulle
93170 Bagnolet / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PELLERIN DE BEAUVAIS, Gilles
Helene Garden, Unit A2
22 Stanley Beach Road
Hong-Kong / HK
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Icosa
83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau
75014 Paris / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201550.319.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateEP2017030645020.10.2017         Original published format: EP 17306450
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473176
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0488, A61B5/0492
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENDOTRACHEALTUBUS ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER KEHLKOPFMUSKULATUR UND -NERVEN[2019/17]
English:ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE FOR NERVE MONITORING[2019/17]
French:TUBE ENDOTRACHÉAL POUR LE MONITORING DES NERFS ET MUSCLES LARYNGÉS[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011041684  (MEDTRONIC XOMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0091] * * figures 3-7,10 * [I] 3,9,12,15;
 [A]EP0438863  (GOLDSTONE ANDREW C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, column 6, line 26 - line 41 * * figures 1-4 *