Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473378

EP3473378 - POSITIONING SYSTEM ADAPTED TO OPERATION AT LOW TEMPERATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
25 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BARRIERE, Jean-Christophe
5 avenue Gustave Eiffel
78180 MONTIGNY LE BRETONNEUX / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201607.119.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateFR2017005992820.10.2017         Original published format: FR 1759928
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3473378
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3473378
Date:01.05.2019
Language:FR
[2019/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B23Q16/00, B23Q16/06, B23Q1/66
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POSITIONIERSYSTEM, DAS AN EINEN NIEDRIGTEMPERATURBETRIEB ANGEPASST IST[2019/17]
English:POSITIONING SYSTEM ADAPTED TO OPERATION AT LOW TEMPERATURES[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE POSITIONNEMENT ADAPTÉ À UN FONCTIONNEMENT À BASSES TEMPERATURES[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
19.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[I]US2004107805  (BALDINI GUIDO [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1, 3a, 3b *;
 [A]US2965208  (FORSTER PETER E, et al) [A] 8-10 * column 3, line 11 - line 34 *;
 [A]GB1374669  (JAUCH K) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *