Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473805

EP3473805 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE DRIVE SYSTEM HEALTH MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYE, Sheridon Everette
106 Highland Road
Mansfield, CT 06250 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date18201612.119.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578802019.10.2017         Original published format: US201715788020
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473805
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/06, F01D21/00, F02K3/06, F02C7/36, G01M15/14, G01H1/10, G01H1/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GESUNDHEITSMONITORINGSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN DES ANTRIEBSSYSTEMS EINES GASTURBINENTRIBWERKS[2019/17]
English:GAS TURBINE ENGINE DRIVE SYSTEM HEALTH MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2019/17]
French:SYSÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA SANTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.12.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
Documents cited:Search[X]US2016010494  (ERLUND MARK NICHOLAS [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0101]; claims 1-13 *;
 [X]US5365787  (HERNANDEZ WALTER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-13 * column 1, line 9 - line 17; figures 1, 3a-3c, 6-10 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 19 * * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 36 * * column 7, line 15 - line 40 * * column 11, line 41 - column 15, line 14 * * column 23, line 50 - column 24, line 43 * * column 26, line 8 - column 27, line 43 *;
 [A]EP2980545  (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AP]EP3287629  (ROLLS-ROYCE CORP [US]) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *