Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473806

EP3473806 - TURBINE ENGINE CASING COMPRISING A CENTRAL PORTION PROJECTING RELATIVE TO TWO SIDE PORTIONS IN A JOINING REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
07.06.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
07.06.2019Change - designated statespublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES
2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / TABLEAU, Nicolas Paul
c/o SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI) Rond-Point
René Ravaud -
Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
02 / CONGRATEL, Sébastien Serge Francis
c/o SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI) Rond-Point
René Ravaud -
Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
03 / DANIS, Antoine Claude Michel Etienne
c/o SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI) Rond-Point
René Ravaud -
Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
04 / JUDET, Maurice Guy
c/o SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI) Rond-Point
René Ravaud -
Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
05 / QUENNEHEN, Lucien Henri Jacques
c/o SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES PI (AJI) Rond-Point
René Ravaud -
Réau
77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18201699.822.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateFR2017005998623.10.2017         Original published format: FR 1759986
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473806
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/14, F01D5/28, F01D9/04, F01D11/08, F01D25/24, F01D25/28, F01D11/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/28]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEHÄUSE FÜR EIN TURBOTRIEBWERK, DAS EINEN ZENTRALEN ABSCHNITT UMFASST, DER RELATIV ZU ZWEI SEITENABSCHNITTEN IM BEREICH EINER VERBINDUNG HERVORRAGT[2019/17]
English:TURBINE ENGINE CASING COMPRISING A CENTRAL PORTION PROJECTING RELATIVE TO TWO SIDE PORTIONS IN A JOINING REGION[2019/17]
French:CARTER POUR TURBOMACHINE COMPRENANT UNE PORTION CENTRALE EN SAILLIE RELATIVEMENT À DEUX PORTIONS LATÉRALES DANS UNE RÉGION DE JONCTION[2019/17]
Examination procedure28.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/28]
28.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2016146942  (HERAKLES [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 5, lines 3,4; figures 1,3 * * page 2, line 19 - line 29 * * page 5, line 29 * * page 9, line 20 - line 24 *;
 [A]FR2919345  (SNECMA SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]FR3036433  (SNECMA [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2017101882  (SIPPEL AARON D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *